Anda di halaman 1dari 2

# Trik Perkalian dan Pembagian Cepat

## Perhatikan contoh-contoh berikut ini :

1.
2.
3.
4.
5.

13 x 17 = 1x2|3x7 = 221
23 x 27 = 2x3|3x7 = 621
33 x 37 = 3x4|3x7 = 1221
43 x 47 = 4x5|3x7 = 2021
53 x 57 = 5x6|3x7 = 3021, dst.

Contoh lain :
1. 32 x 25 = 8 x 4 x 25 = 8 x 100 = 800
2. 64 x 12,5 = 8 x 8 x 12,5 = 8 x 100 = 800
3. 125 x 800 = 125 x 8 x 100 = 1000 x 100 = 100.000
Dengan pendekatan 10, 100, ... :
(100 + a)(100 + b) = 10000 + (a+b)100 + ab
Contoh :
1. 104 x 105 = (100 + 4)(100 + 5) = 10000 + 900 + 20 = 10920
2. 106 x 103 = (100 + 6)(100 + 3) = 10000 + 900 + 18 = 10918
(100 - a)(100 - b) = 10000 - (a+b)100 + ab
Contoh :
1. 97 x 96 = (100 3)(100 4) = 10.000 700 +12 = 9312
2. 96 x 95 = (100 4)(100 5) = 10.000 900 +20 = 9120
(10 + a)(10 - b) = 100 + (a-b)10 - ab
Contoh :
1. 13 x 8 = (10 + 3) (10 2) = 100 + (3-2)10 3.2 = 104
2. 14 x 7 = (10 + 4) (10 3) = 100 + (4-3)10 4.3 = 98
Dengan pengelompokan :
1.
2.
3.
4.

## 751 x 754 = 75^2|(1+4).75|1.4 = 5625+37|5|4 = 566254

325 x 425 = 3.4|(3+4).25|25^2 = 12+1|75+6|25 = 138125
2512 x 2512 = 25^2|25.24|12.12 = 625+6|00+1|44 = 6310144
2011 x 2011 = 2^2|2.022|011^2 = 4|044|121 = 4044121

Contoh pembagian :

1.
2.
3.
4.
5.
6.

## 4949 : 7 = (4900 : 7) + (49 : 7) = 700 + 7 = 707

5463 : 9 = (5400 : 9) + (63 : 9) = 600 + 7 = 607
4249 : 7 = = 607
2436 : 4 = = 609
3515 : 5 = = 703
6432 : 8 = = 804